+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 14, 2015: Adopted (House)
January 8, 2015: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor