+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules