+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules