+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules