+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2017: Adopted (House)
March 10, 2017: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor