+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules