+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2013: Adopted (House)
March 15, 2013: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor