+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules