+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules