+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2014: Adopted (House)
January 15, 2014: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor