+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2019: Adopted (House)
January 17, 2019: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor