+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules