+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2018: Passed (House)
March 15, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor