+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2017: Passed (House)
March 24, 2017: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor