+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Vote
February 21, 2018: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor