+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance