+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Immediate Release
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Mettetal, Barton, Jackson)
On March 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On March 25, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On March 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: LP To FI
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private;Finance
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
March 25, 2018: Passed (House)
March 25, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor