+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89
On March 27, 2022 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 26, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Beckett,Bounds
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,Parks,Williams
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations