+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 25, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Sullivan,Pigott
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Carmichael,Burton
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations