+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations