+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Simmons (13th),DeBar
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Busby,Arnold
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations