+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 26, 2017 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Horhn,Tindell
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Snowden,Barker
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations