+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Vote
April 14, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor