+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2016: Passed (House)
April 19, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor