+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Pigott,Mangold
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,Jackson (32nd),Hill
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations