+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Barton,Bennett,Roberson
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Jackson (15th),Gollott,Parker
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On April 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
April 13, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor