+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,White,Beckett
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Blackwell
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Immediate Release
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations