+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Immediate Release
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations