+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: LP To FI
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private;Finance
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2014: Passed (House)
March 7, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor