+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Mayo
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Longwitz
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance