+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2020: Passed (House)
June 10, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor