+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
- Conference Report Filed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
On March 30, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Shows,Currie
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Carmichael,Collins
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations