+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To PP
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: PP To AP
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property;Appropriations
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: PP To AP
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property;Appropriations
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2018: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
February 22, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
January 31, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor