+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations