+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 29, 2015 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Johnson,Barker
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Simmons (13th),Wiggins
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations