+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 17, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Beckett
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,McDaniel
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Huddleston (15th), Frierson)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations