+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Sullivan,Huddleston (15th)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Jackson (15th)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations