+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Military Affairs
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: Passed (House)
February 11, 2019: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor