+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Mettetal,Beckett
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Burton
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Coleman (65th), Frierson, Huddleston (15th), Holland)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations