+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Statutes Amended (30)
- 091-0008-0105 -
- 027-0010-0001 -
- 027-0010-0003 -
- 027-0010-0005 -
- 027-0010-0007 -
- 027-0010-0009 -
- 027-0010-0011 -
- 027-0010-0013 -
- 027-0010-0015 -
- 027-0010-0017 -
- 027-0010-0019 -
- 027-0010-0021 -
- 027-0010-0023 -
- 027-0010-0025 -
- 089-0021-0001 -
- 089-0021-0003 -
- 089-0021-0005 -
- 089-0021-0007 -
- 089-0021-0009 -
- 089-0021-0011 -
- 089-0021-0013 -
- 089-0021-0015 -
- 089-0021-0017 -
- 091-0009-0501 -
- 091-0009-0503 -
- 091-0009-0505 -
- 091-0009-0507 -
- 091-0009-0509 -
- 091-0009-0511 -
- 091-0007-0259 -
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2020: Passed (House)
March 11, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor