+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 13, 2019: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor