+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Named Baker,Reynolds,Roberson
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Turner-Ford
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 28, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 12, 2019: Passed As Amended (House)
February 12, 2019: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor