+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Warren, Holland)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2013: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
March 14, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
February 28, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor