+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Harkins,Johnson,Chassaniol
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
February 3, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor