+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2017: Passed (House)
February 2, 2017: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor