+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Workforce Development
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2021: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
February 10, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor