+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Harkins,Parker,Fillingane
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: FI To EC
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance;Economic and Workforce Development
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
February 18, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor