+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2013: Passed (House)
February 7, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor