+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Straughter, Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Collins,Ward,Fillingane
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Cockerham,Bennett
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 4, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
February 12, 2015: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor