+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Steverson, Hines)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
February 10, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor